U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:16-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beeson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • July 06, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Mail Returned - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • November 17, 2021: [Certificate of Service ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 13, 2021: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.