U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shambo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 11, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.