U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:05-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schoenthal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Vacate]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 18, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.