U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morgan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: [Transcript - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.