U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gundlach
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 17, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 30, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 30, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 17, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.