U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acosta et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • May 12, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sanctions ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Sanctions ]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 26, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • July 26, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 28, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 15, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 05, 2022: [Response - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 29, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 15, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • December 15, 2021: [Letter - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 07, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 18, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • October 18, 2021: [Letter - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • October 04, 2021: [Letter - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 16, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Sealed Document]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [Letter - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • August 24, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 12, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 09, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • August 02, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 19, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • June 23, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • June 23, 2021: [Letter - MT]
  • June 14, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • June 14, 2021: [Letter - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Docket Entry AND Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • May 12, 2021: [Letter - MT]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 11, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 06, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • May 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 28, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • April 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 27, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 19, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.