U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • May 06, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 22, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.