U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Connelly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 09, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 09, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 11, 2025: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • June 15, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • June 11, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2021: [Revoke]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 12, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 21, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Case Unsealed]
  • April 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 21, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.