U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STEADY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 06, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 28, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 28, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • June 24, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 24, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 20, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • August 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.