U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Piccione et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Letter - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 21, 2022: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • June 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • June 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Vacate]
  • March 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Vacate]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 28, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • December 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 02, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 02, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Remark - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.