U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Milch et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 18, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 17, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 12, 2021: [Response - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 20, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 11, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 11, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 11, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 09, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 07, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 29, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.