U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shaw
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Travel ]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 12, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 12, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 12, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 01, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 01, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • May 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 10, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • May 07, 2021: [Quash ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.