U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hulford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 03, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 20, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 20, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 14, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • May 13, 2021: [Appear]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.