U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Creason
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Remark - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 04, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 04, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 06, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 01, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 14, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.