U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stillman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 12, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 12, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 27, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 07, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 07, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 01, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 30, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 16, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 15, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.