U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nunez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 14, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 14, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Response - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 02, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 01, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 01, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 18, 2021: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 18, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 17, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 28, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • April 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.