U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Strack
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 01, 2022: [Dismiss ]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 22, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 21, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 01, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 23, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.