U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00004-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Dobler et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 18, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
  • April 26, 2021: [Remark - MT]
  • April 26, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.