U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stephenson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 20, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 26, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 26, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 26, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.