U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fasuga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 16, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 15, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • June 15, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 28, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 26, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 26, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 26, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.