U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alvarez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Exhibits Returned/Disposed - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 22, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • November 11, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Vacate]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • June 01, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 11, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.