U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Costa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • June 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.