U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 05, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Docket Call]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 16, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.