U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Willoughby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • August 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.