U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 27, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 31, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 17, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 10, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 28, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.