U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cockrill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 18, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 18, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Competency Hearing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • May 05, 2022: [Appear]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Forensic Evaluation Report - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Letter - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 26, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 20, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 13, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 08, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Remark - MT]
  • April 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.