U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fritsch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 03, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 03, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 13, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 13, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 13, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 29, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 24, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.