U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Draper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 19, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 19, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 06, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [In Limine ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 20, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 20, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • June 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 07, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 04, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 25, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.