U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Naron
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 02, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 02, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • April 05, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Vacate]
  • March 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • April 29, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.