U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00123-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Espinosa et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • June 01, 2021: [Remark - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • May 28, 2021: [Appear]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.