U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lapie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 01, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • July 19, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 14, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 14, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 30, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 30, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.