U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Portland General Electric Company et al v. NorthWestern Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2023: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 15, 2022: [Permanent Injunction]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • September 02, 2022: [Status Report Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 01, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 15, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2022: [Amicus Brief - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 21, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • February 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • February 08, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • January 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 23, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • December 23, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 03, 2021: [Appendix - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 03, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 03, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Compel]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 19, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • November 19, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 19, 2021: [Stay]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • November 04, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 04, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • October 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Staying Case]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 15, 2021: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [Stipulation]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
  • August 06, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
  • August 06, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • July 21, 2021: [Vacate]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • July 15, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 01, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • June 18, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 17, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 17, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 09, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • June 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 04, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 03, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • June 03, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 03, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Appendix - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 25, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 25, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 20, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • May 19, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 19, 2021: [Remark]
  • May 19, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 17, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 14, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 12, 2021: [Proof of Service - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 04, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.