U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Friedt v. Bludworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Alter Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • December 06, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Staying Case]
  • November 02, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 19, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • July 02, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • June 14, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • May 04, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.