U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kelly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2023: [Arrest ]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 06, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 28, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • February 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 02, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 14, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 14, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 27, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 26, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • May 04, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.