U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Chesmore v. CPS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • May 04, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.