U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Haffey v. State of Montana Parole and Probation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 09, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 05, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.