U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Rough v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [In Limine]
  • June 27, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Appendix - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Clarify - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Appendix - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 03, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • August 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 11, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • August 11, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 29, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • July 26, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 06, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 06, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.