U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Stokes et al v. Christopher et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [USCA Order - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [USCA Order - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 17, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 06, 2021: [Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 06, 2021: [Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-Mail - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.