U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dawes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [821 Remark-MT]
  • October 10, 2024: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment (782/821)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 13, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 13, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 13, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 13, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 10, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Remark - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • May 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 06, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • May 06, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.