U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Murphy v. KB Orthopedics, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • August 10, 2021: [Transfer Order MDL - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 26, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 26, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 14, 2021: [Remark]
  • May 14, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 14, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 12, 2021: [Remand]
  • May 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Stay]
  • May 06, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.