U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Gallatin County et al v. Atlantic Speciality Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 07, 2021: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Response to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • August 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 09, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 09, 2021: [Stay]
  • August 04, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • August 04, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • June 17, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • June 07, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 06, 2021: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.