U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00051
  • Case Name: In Re Tucker
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • July 13, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 06, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.