U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 24, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 24, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 07, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.