U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hillis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 23, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 06, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 06, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 28, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • May 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 13, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 13, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.