U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hopwood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • November 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.