U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Kelly v. Direct Express Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.