U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Capitol Indemnity Corporation v. Reflections Academy, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2023: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 17, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • November 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 29, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 24, 2021: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • November 24, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2021: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Default]
  • October 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • October 15, 2021: [Set Aside Default]
  • October 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 30, 2021: [Entry of Default]
  • September 30, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • September 27, 2021: [Intervene]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • July 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 22, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • July 22, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • July 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • May 07, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 07, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.