U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Plante
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 28, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 28, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 19, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 02, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam - SDM]
  • June 17, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 12, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 12, 2021: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • May 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.