U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soberanes Cuadras
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 10, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 28, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 27, 2021: [3731 Certification]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • June 22, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • June 18, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 04, 2021: [Certificate of Service ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 04, 2021: [Suppress ]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 10, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 10, 2021: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • May 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.