U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morsette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 20, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 06, 2021: [Bond Hearing - SDM]
  • July 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • June 30, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • June 22, 2021: [Revoke]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • June 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • May 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • May 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 20, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • May 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • May 20, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 07, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.